MA S196 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2533
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a sales tax holiday
Title
To Establish a Sales Tax Holiday.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Fargo [D] | Sen. John Hart [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Michael Knapik [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Accompanied a study order, see S2533 | |
2010-03-24 | House concurred | |
2010-03-22 | Discharged to the committee on Joint Committee on Revenue | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S2533 (Replaced by) 2010-07-06 - Discharged to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S196 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=5230&generalCourtId=2 |