MA S1963 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Reported by S2410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Reported by S2410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate, Tuesday, July 12, 2011 – Recommended new draft from the
Title
Regarding families and children engaged in services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-31 | Senate | Reported by S2410 |
2012-07-27 | House | Committee of Conference appointed, in concurrence (Dempsey-Donato-Winslow) |
2012-07-27 | House | House insisted on its amendment |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed (Spilka-Flanagan-Knapik) |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the House amendment |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-25 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 324) |
2012-07-25 | House | For House amendments, see H4330 |
2012-07-25 | House | Read third |
2012-07-11 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2012-07-09 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-07-09 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4244 |
2011-07-18 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed (see Roll Call 54 - Yeas 39 - Nays 0) |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Read third |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Pending Ways and Means amendement adopted, as amended |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2011-07-12 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-07-12 | Senate | Recommended new draft for H3492 |
2011-07-12 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1963 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17148&generalCourtId=1 |