MA S1982 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1970
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-30 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #102 [Yeas 36-Nays 2]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-30 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #102 [Yeas 36-Nays 2]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to innovative communities (Senate, No. 1970),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 1982).
Title
Relative to innovative communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-30 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #102 [Yeas 36-Nays 2] |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Reprinted as amended S1986 |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Read third |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Substituted as amended for S1970 |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Spilka) adopted |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Chang-Diaz) adopted |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Chang-Diaz) rejected |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Ross) adopted |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Keenan) rejected |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Keenan) adopted |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Keenan) adopted |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Keenan) adopted |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Lewis) rejected |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Joyce) adopted |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #96 [Yeas 9 - Nays 29] |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S1970 |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1970 (Replaces) 2015-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1982
S1986 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S230 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S122 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2144
S1127 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1846 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1847 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1416 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1986 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S230 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S122 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2144
S1127 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1846 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1847 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1416 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1982 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1982.pdf |