MA S1989 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote road safety. Transportation.
Title
Promoting road safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1649 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1992 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
S1921 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1014 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2002 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2358
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1919 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1839 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H2726 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1856 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H3903 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H38 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4099
H4140 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S1992 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
S1921 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1014 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2002 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2358
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1919 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1839 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H2726 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1856 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H3903 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H38 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4099
H4140 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1989 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1989.pdf |