MA S1992 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S610
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to manufactured housing communities; and (House, No. 1116) of Attorney General Martha Coakley and others relative to manufactured housing communities,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 1992).
Title
Relative to manufactured housing communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Reported (in part) by S2318 |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2014-01-30 | Senate | New draft of S610 and H1116 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S610 (Replaces) 2014-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1992
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1992 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1992.pdf |