MA S1994 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-24 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-24 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote the civil rights and inclusion of American Muslims in the commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Promoting the civil rights and inclusion of American Muslims in the commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-24 | House | House concurred |
2024-07-19 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Tuesday December 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence |
2024-07-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-07-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 19, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S953 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1536 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Senate concurred
H3052 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - House concurred
H3863 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4902
H1536 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Senate concurred
H3052 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - House concurred
H3863 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4902
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1994 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1994.pdf |