MA S200 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2486
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to gaming. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to gaming
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2486 |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S183 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4398
H2007 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2832 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H10 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4398
H1951 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H3474 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S205 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S2486 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2007 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2832 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H10 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4398
H1951 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H3474 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S205 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S2486 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S200 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S200.pdf |