MA S2005 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 140 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 140 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the town charter for the town of Ashburnham (Senate, No. 1906).
Title
Relative to the town charter for the town of Ashburnham
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 140 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-10-17 | House | Enacted |
2011-10-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-09-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-09-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-09-08 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-09-06 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-06 | Senate | Substituted for S1906 |
2011-09-06 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Brewer) for S1906 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2005 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17333&generalCourtId=1 |