MA S2005 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a vendors’ collection allowance. Revenue.
Title
To establish a vendors’ collection allowance
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5250 |
2022-01-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1867 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1907 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3003 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1975 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1860 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2849 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1907 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3003 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1975 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1860 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2849 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2005 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2005.pdf |