MA S2006 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to solar net metering fairness. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to solar net metering fairness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2552 |
2019-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2323 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1970 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1609 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2870 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1980 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1974 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1623 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1999 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2866 (Similar To) 2020-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1591 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1970 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1609 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2870 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1980 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1974 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1623 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1999 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2866 (Similar To) 2020-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1591 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2006 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2006.pdf |