MA S2009 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the town of Essex. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the town of Essex
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Senate | Accompanying a new draft, see S2246 |
2012-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2012 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2012-04-19 | House | House concurred |
2012-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, May 18, 2012 |
2011-09-19 | House | House concurred |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2009 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17372&generalCourtId=1 |