MA S2010 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2420
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to extend veterans status for the National Guard and Reserves. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Extending veterans status for the National Guard and Reserves
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] |
Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2420 |
2017-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2017-05-08 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2015 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2016 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2363
S2031 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2032 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
H1947 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
S2236 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2611
S2420 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2016 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2363
S2031 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2032 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
H1947 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
S2236 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2611
S2420 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2010 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2010.pdf |