MA S2014 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1812
Note: Replaces legislation S2021
Note: Replaces legislation S2021
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-24 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #164 (YEAS 38 - NAYS 0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-24 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #164 (YEAS 38 - NAYS 0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle license suspension (Senate, No. 1812),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2014).
Title
Relative to motor vehicle license suspension
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #164 (YEAS 38 - NAYS 0) |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2021 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Read third |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S1812 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Pending Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Spilka) adopted |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Tarr) rejected |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Tarr) adopted |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tarr) rejected |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Read second |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, September 24th, 2015 |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S1812 |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1812 (Replaces) 2015-09-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2014
S2021 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2016
S2476 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S773 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1903 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S134 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2245
S1893 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1852 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S710 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S799 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S402 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1481 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2021 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2016
S2476 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S773 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1903 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S134 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2245
S1893 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1852 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S710 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S799 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S402 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1481 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2014 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2014.pdf |