MA S2016 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2477
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - New draft substituted, see S2477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - New draft substituted, see S2477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the continuing education requirements for certain real estate appraisers and trainees. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Futher regulating the continuing education requirements for certain real estate appraisers and trainees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-20 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2477 |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Read second |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2477 |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-02-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/15/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-09-19 | House | House concurred |
2011-08-08 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2011-08-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-07-25 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2477 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2016 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17026&generalCourtId=1 |