MA S202 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the continuing education requirements for real estate brokers and salespersons. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Further regulating the continuing education requirements for real estate brokers and salespersons
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2675 |
2021-07-07 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-07 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2021-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2215 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H578 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S360 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H614 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4643
H3615 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S311 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
S310 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1570 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2675 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S208 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
H428 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
H578 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S360 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H614 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4643
H3615 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S311 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
S310 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1570 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2675 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S208 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
H428 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S202 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S202.pdf |