MA S2027 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to real estate tax abatements. Revenue.
Title
Relative to real estate tax abatements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-02-21 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #148 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 0] |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Read third |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2012 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-09-29 | House | House concurred |
2011-08-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2011-08-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-08-08 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2027 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17263&generalCourtId=1 |