MA S2036 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1183
Note: Legislation replaced by S2075
Note: Legislation replaced by S2075
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on October 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-16 - New draft substituted, see S2075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-16 - New draft substituted, see S2075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate. October 20, 2011 -- New draft of S1183 reported from the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security]
Title
Improving safety in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-16 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2075 |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Read second |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2075 |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-10-20 | Senate | New draft of S1183 |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1183 (Replaces) 2011-10-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2036
S2075 (Replaced by) 2012-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2012
S2075 (Replaced by) 2012-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2036 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17514&generalCourtId=1 |