MA S204 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4390
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to teaching excellence. Education.
Title
Relative to teaching excellence
Sponsors
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] | Rep. Frank Smizik [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Gale Candaras [D] |
Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4390 |
2013-09-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4390 (Replaced by) 2014-08-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S204 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S204.pdf |