MA S205 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Rural Policy Advisory Commission. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to the Rural Policy Advisory Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H876 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2741 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H3303 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H364 (Similar To) 2020-08-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
H876 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2741 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H3303 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H364 (Similar To) 2020-08-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S205 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S205.pdf |