MA S2056 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1329
Note: Legislation replaced by S2066
Note: Legislation replaced by S2066
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-15 - Bills in the Third Reading new draft substituted, see S2066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-15 - Bills in the Third Reading new draft substituted, see S2066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restore collective bargaining rights for employees of the MBTA
Title
To restore collective bargaining rights for employees of the MBTA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-15 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading new draft substituted, see S2066 |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Read third |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-11-10 | Senate | New draft of S1329 |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1329 (Replaces) 2011-11-10 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2056
S2066 (Replaced by) 2011-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2011
S2066 (Replaced by) 2011-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2011
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2056 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17595&generalCourtId=1 |