MA S2057 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate, Thursday, November 10, 2011 – New draft of Senate, No. 1857 and House, No. 3310 reported from the committee on Elder Affairs.
Title
Promoting equal choice and related cost savings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4537 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 29, 2012 |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Billl reported favorably by committee and referred to Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-11-14 | Senate | New draft of S1857 and H3310 |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1857 (Replaces) 2011-11-14 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2057
H3310 (Replaces) 2011-11-14 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2057
H4537 (Replaced by) 2012-12-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3310 (Replaces) 2011-11-14 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2057
H4537 (Replaced by) 2012-12-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2057 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17602&generalCourtId=1 |