MA S206 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to identification for the purchase of alcoholic beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to identification for the sale of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
Sen. James Welch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4135 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4135 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S161 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1060 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S185 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S389 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S378 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S203 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2247
S1254 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2633 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S931 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S335 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S161 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1060 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S185 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S389 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S378 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S203 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2247
S1254 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2633 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S931 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S335 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S206 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S206.pdf |