MA S2062 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to affordable housing in the city of Taunton. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to certain affordable housing in the city of Taunton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-03-01 | House | Enacted |
2012-02-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-01-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-01-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-01-17 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-11-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2011 from 10:30 AM-11:30 AM in A-1 |
2011-11-14 | House | House concurred |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2062 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17438&generalCourtId=1 |