MA S2069 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2288
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to authorizing the transfer of certain parcels of land in the town of Hubbardston. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the transfer of certain parcels of land in the town of Hubbardston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2288 |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Read second |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting thereof a new draft, see S2288 |
2014-07-07 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2014 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2014-04-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2014 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2014-03-26 | House | House concurred |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2288 (Replaced by) 2014-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2069 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2069.pdf |