MA S2069 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S446
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance the enforcement of illegal hunting practices,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2069).
Title
Further regulating the enforcement of illegal hunting practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-02-16 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #242 [YEAS 35 - NAYS 0] |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read third (title changed) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #1 (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Humason) adopted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Humason) rejected |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Humason) rejected |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Humason) rejected |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Humason) rejected |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Humason) rejected |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Humason) rejected |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed in the Order of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2016 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2015-11-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-11-25 | Senate | New draft of S446 |
2015-11-25 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S446 (Replaces) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2069
S1244 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1085 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied S878
H1866 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S194 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1333 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S198 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied S135
S1305 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1300 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S660 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S770 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1257 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H1587 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1244 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1085 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied S878
H1866 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S194 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1333 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S198 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied S135
S1305 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1300 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S660 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S770 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1257 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H1587 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2069 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2069.pdf |