MA S2082 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure greater transparency and accountability in the Commonwealth’s commuter rail system. Transportation.
Title
To ensure greater transparency and accountability in the Commonwealth’s commuter rail system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2560 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2560 |
2019-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2082 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2082.pdf |