MA S2088 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Michael Foti, an employee of the department of correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Michael Foti, an employee of the Department of Correction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-03-05 | House | Enacted |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-02-29 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-02-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-02-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-02-23 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third, and passed to be engrossed |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to Senate Committee on Ways and Means |
2011-12-01 | House | House concurred |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2088 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17466&generalCourtId=1 |