MA S2091 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2444
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to swimming pool licensing. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to swimming pool licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2444 |
2012-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2012 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-12-12 | House | House concurred |
2011-12-05 | Senate | Referred to the Joint committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2011-12-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2444 (Replaced by) 2012-10-01 - Discharged to the Senate committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2091 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17534&generalCourtId=1 |