MA S2092 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to motor vehicle safety checkpoints. Transportation.
Title
Defining special regulations for vehicle specific checkpoints
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3385 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3385 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2092 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2092.pdf |