MA S2095 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the election of the Freetown Lakeville regional school district committee members. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to the election of the Freetown Lakeville regional school district committee members
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Rep. David Sullivan [D] | Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] | Rep. Christopher Markey [D] |
Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-01-12 | House | Enacted |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-01-12 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-01-12 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended and passed to be engrossed |
2012-01-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-01-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-01-12 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-01-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2011-12-15 | House | House concurred |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-12-05 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2095 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17671&generalCourtId=1 |