MA S2104 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3680
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - See H3680
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - See H3680
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate June 29, 2017, – Text of the Senate amendment to the House Bill establishing the Massachusetts pregnant workers fairness act (House, No. 3680, amended)
Title
Text of the Senate amendment to the House Bill establishing the Massachusetts pregnant workers fairness act (House, No. 3680, amended)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | See H3680 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Text of S2093, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H3680 (Replaced by) 2017-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2017
H3659 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - New draft substituted, see H3680
S1023 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
H1038 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
S2093 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
H3816 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Text of an amendment, see H3680
H3659 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - New draft substituted, see H3680
S1023 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
H1038 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
S2093 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
H3816 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Text of an amendment, see H3680
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2104 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2104.pdf |