MA S2109 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reliability on Cape Cod
Title
Reliability on Cape Cod
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-31 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-31 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-31 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for for the next sitting | |
2010-07-31 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-07-23 | Read; and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-07-21 | Passed to be engrossed - 35 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Senate Roll Call, No. 97) | |
2009-07-21 | Read third (title changed) | |
2009-07-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-07-20 | Substituted for S1529 | |
2009-07-20 | Read second | |
2009-07-20 | Rules suspended | |
2009-07-20 | Recommended new draft for S1529 | |
2009-07-20 | Reported from the committee on Senate Committee On Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s02109.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st02/st02109.htm |