MA S2111 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S215
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the afterschool and out-of-school time coordinating council
Title
Establishing the afterschool and out-of-school time coordinating council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-08-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-08-13 | House | Enacted |
2012-08-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-08-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-08-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-08-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-26 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2012-01-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Ways and Means |
2012-01-23 | Senate | New draft of S215 |
2012-01-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S215 (Replaces) 2012-01-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2111