MA S2115 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the board of selectmen of Hardwick to appoint the town treasurer. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the board of selectmen of Hardwick to appoint the town treasurer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-03-06 | House | Enacted |
2018-03-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-02-06 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-07-17 | House | House concurred |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2114 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2018
S2586 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 331 of the Acts of 2018
S2586 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 331 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2115 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2115.pdf |