MA S2136 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-07 - Again adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-07 - Again adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a tax force on local retail sector
Title
Establishing a Special Senate Task Force on the local retail sector of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-07 | Senate | Again adopted |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Amendment (Rosenberg-Tarr) adopted |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Motion for reconsideration prevails |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Again adopted |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Amendment (Rosenberg-Tarr) Adopted |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Motion for reconsideration prevails |
2017-07-31 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-07-28 | Senate | Order filed |
Same As/Similar To
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2238 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H162 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2041 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H2888 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2238 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H162 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2041 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H2888 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2136 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2136.pdf |