MA S2136 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge in the town of Dedham as the Honorable Kelly A. Timilty Memorial Bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the town of Dedham as the Honorable Kelly A. Timilty Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2136 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2136.pdf |