MA S2145 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to a Wareham Redevelopment Authority. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to a Wareham Redevelopment Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-02-28 | House | Enacted |
2018-02-26 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-01-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-01-08 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-08-07 | House | House concurred |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2144 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2018
H2242 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S1152 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2017
S2307 (Similar To) 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2018
H4958 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 414 of the Acts of 2018
H2242 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S1152 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2017
S2307 (Similar To) 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2018
H4958 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 414 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2145 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2145.pdf |