MA S2149 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2719
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fair and stable utility pricing. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to fair and stable utility pricing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2719 |
2024-04-03 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4234 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2560 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S2566 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2719 (Replaced by) 2024-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2560 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S2566 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2719 (Replaced by) 2024-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2149 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2149.pdf |