MA S2154 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for timely reimbursement of cities and towns for veterans’ benefits. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Providing for timely reimbursement of cities and towns for veterans’ benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1313 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
H3207 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3196 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3207 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3196 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2154 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2154.pdf |