MA S2158 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase routine screening for HIV
Title
To increase routine screening for HIV
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-04-11 | House | Enacted |
2012-04-09 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-04-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-03-05 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Read third |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Senate Ethics and Rules amendments adopted |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Amendment (Jehlen) adopted |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Read second |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 1, 2012 |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1997 |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2158 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=91674&generalCourtId=1 |