MA S2181 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2108
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the natural resources of the commonwealth
Title
Protecting the natural resources of the commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-10-19 | Senate | New draft of H2108 and S419 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2108 (Replaces) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2181
H403 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
S1700 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H458 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
S2175 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2735 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2613 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - See S2591
H403 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
S1700 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H458 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
S2175 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2735 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2613 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - See S2591
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2181 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2181.pdf |