MA S2193 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1819
Note: Legislation replaced by S2241
Note: Legislation replaced by S2241
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - New draft substituted, see S2241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - New draft substituted, see S2241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to veterans' access, livelihood, opportunity, and resources
Title
Relative to veterans' access, livelihood, opportunity, and resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2241 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Read second |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2241 |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee Senate Ways and Means |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Joint Rules |
2012-03-29 | Senate | New draft of S1819, S1822, S1823, S1825, S1831, S1835, H961, H963, H965, H3307, H3323, H3425 and H3658 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Veteran and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1819 (Replaces) 2011-06-03 - Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 01:30 PM-03:30 PM in Lynn City Council Chambers
S2241 (Replaced by) 2012-05-03 - Reprinted as amended, see S2254
S2241 (Replaced by) 2012-05-03 - Reprinted as amended, see S2254
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2193 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=116513&generalCourtId=1 |