MA S2193 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 342 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 342 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the board of selectmen of the town of Westport to borrow money for the payment of certain medical expenses for certain public safety personnel. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the board of selectmen of the town of Westport to borrow money for the payment of certain medical expenses for certain public safety personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 342 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-10-02 | House | Enacted |
2014-09-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-07-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2014 from 10:30 AM-11:30 AM in A-2 |
2014-06-16 | House | House concurred |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2193 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2193.pdf |