MA S2193 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the title of musician laureate of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
To create the title of musician laureate of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2023-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2807 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2193 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2193.pdf |