MA S2200 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Reported, in part, by S2372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Reported, in part, by S2372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to criminal justice reform (being the text of Senate document number 2185, printed as amended)
Title
Relative to criminal justice reform
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-11-14 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 297 (Y: 144 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On further Amendment Yea and Nay No. 295 (Y: 110 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 80 Yea and Nay No. 294 (Y: 118 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On adoption of consolidated amendment A Yea and Nay No. 293 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 54 Yea and Nay No. 292 (Y: 136 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 3 Yea and Nay No. 291 (Y: 118 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 160 Yea and Nay No. 290 (Y: 128 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 68 Yea and Nay No. 289 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 42 Yea and Nay No. 288 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - House - House On further Amendment Yea and Nay No. 286 (Y: 117 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - House - House On Amendment 162 Yea and Nay No. 284 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On further Amendment Yea and Nay No. 295 (Y: 110 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 80 Yea and Nay No. 294 (Y: 118 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On adoption of consolidated amendment A Yea and Nay No. 293 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 54 Yea and Nay No. 292 (Y: 136 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 3 Yea and Nay No. 291 (Y: 118 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 160 Yea and Nay No. 290 (Y: 128 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 68 Yea and Nay No. 289 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House On Amendment 42 Yea and Nay No. 288 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - House - House On further Amendment Yea and Nay No. 286 (Y: 117 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - House - House On Amendment 162 Yea and Nay No. 284 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported, in part, by S2372 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported, in part, by S2371 |
2017-11-30 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Cronin-Mariano-Harrington), in concurrence |
2017-11-30 | House | House insisted on its amendment |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Brownsberger-Creem-Tarr), appointed |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the House amendment |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-14 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 144 YEAS to 9 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 297) |
2017-11-13 | House | Read third |
2017-11-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-08 | House | Read second, amended by substitution of a new text (H4011) and ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment (H4011) pending |
2017-11-06 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment (H4011) and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-11-02 | House | Order adopted, see H3996 |
2017-11-01 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches acting concurrently |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #231 [YEAS 27 to NAYS 10] |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Text of S2185, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H3996 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2354 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2371 (Replaced by) 2018-04-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2018
S2372 (Replaced by) 2018-05-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2018
S2354 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2371 (Replaced by) 2018-04-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2018
S2372 (Replaced by) 2018-05-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2018