MA S2222 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts paint stewardship program. Revenue.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts paint stewardship program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-06-23 | House | House concurred |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Revenue |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2222 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2222.pdf |