MA S2223 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2711
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to enhancing RPS standards. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to enhancing RPS standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2711 |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S2213 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3311 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S590 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
S2155 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2153 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2711 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2213 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3311 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S590 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
S2155 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2153 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2711 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2223 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2223.pdf |