MA S2231 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2711
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the establishment of the Massachusetts Clean Energy Technology Center. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to green financing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2711 |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1706 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H3315 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3316 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2711 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1198 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1706 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H3315 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3316 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2711 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1198 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4796
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2231 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2231.pdf |