MA S224 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect hospital and community health center patients. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To prevent unscrupulous medical debt recovery practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1160 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H179 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4547
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2815 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H179 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4547
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2815 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S224 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S224.pdf |