MA S2253 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen the review process for a medically conditioned license to operate a motor vehicle. Transportation.
Title
To strengthen the review process for a medically conditioned license to operate a motor vehicle
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
H4544 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4544 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2253 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2253.pdf |